Case: 05-01-00143-CR
05-01-00143-CR
01/29/2001
Capital Murder
Bell, Javarro
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/05/2004 | Return to storage | | |
05/28/2004 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
04/08/2004 | Pulled from storage | | |
04/08/2004 | Record Shipped | | |
09/17/2002 | Letter Received | | |
09/17/2002 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
07/31/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/31/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/24/2002 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
05/31/2002 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
05/29/2002 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
04/25/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
04/10/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/10/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
04/09/2002 | Record Shipped | | |
03/25/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
03/22/2002 | Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/01/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/01/2002 | Record Retention | Retain | |
03/01/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/05/2001 | Submitted | | |
10/05/2001 | Submission | | |
10/05/2001 | Submitted | | |
09/22/2001 | Supplemental Record Due | | |
08/31/2001 | Brief Due | | |
08/24/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
08/20/2001 | Submission | | |
08/01/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
08/01/2001 | Case reinstated | | |
08/01/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/01/2001 | Order Entered | Vacated | |
08/01/2001 | Case reinstated | | |
07/30/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/30/2001 | Brief Received | | |
07/25/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/24/2001 | Order Entered | | |
07/24/2001 | Order Entered | Abated | |
07/24/2001 | Order Entered | Abated | |
06/29/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/28/2001 | Notice To Appellant that Brief is late | | |
06/13/2001 | Brief Due | | |
05/14/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/13/2001 | Brief Due | | |
05/11/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/13/2001 | Brief Due | | |
04/11/2001 | Record due | | |
04/06/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/05/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/14/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
02/21/2001 | Amended Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/20/2001 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
02/01/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
01/30/2001 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
01/29/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/29/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/29/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/21/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
12/12/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/12/2000 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/31/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Victoria Franklin | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 291st District Court |
Javarro Bell | Criminal - Appellant | Robert P. Abbott |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. Larissa Roeder |
Bridget Barnhill | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Bridget Barnhill |
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
F00-71885-JU
life