Case: 04-81-00466-CR
04-81-00466-CR
12/10/1981
Other Drug Possession
Montana, Ernest Rodriguez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/19/1986 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
01/24/1986 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
05/23/1985 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
10/24/1984 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
04/17/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/17/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/29/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/29/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/29/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/28/1983 | Brief Filed | | |
10/19/1982 | Submission | | |
10/19/1982 | Submission | | |
10/19/1982 | Submitted | | |
02/19/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/19/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
02/19/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/10/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/03/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
12/23/1981 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/21/1981 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
12/10/1981 | Brief Filed | | |
12/10/1981 | Record Filed | | |
12/10/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/10/1981 | Record Approved | | |
10/05/1981 | Motion EOT to file Objections Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
09/29/1981 | Motion EOT to file Objections Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/20/2013 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
04/17/1984 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
79-CR-0191
Life