Case Heading (S-18-0265) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0265 | Case Docketed On: | 11/20/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief | ||
Short Title: | RONALD GRAHAM PERKINS, individually and as Wrongful Death Representative of the heirs of Lavonne Perkins, a Wyoming resident v. GORDER-SOUTH GROUP, d/b/a GSG ARCHITECTURE, INC. | ||||
Full Title: | RONALD GRAHAM PERKINS, individually and as Wrongful Death Representative of the heirs of Lavonne Perkins, a Wyoming resident, Petitioner, v. GORDER-SOUTH GROUP, d/b/a GSG ARCHITECTURE, INC., Respondent. |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Petitioner | Ronald Graham Perkins | Scott J. Olheiser Renee Melancon Charles W. Branham III |
Respondent | Gorder-South Group d/b/a GSG Architecture, Inc. | Joseph Emil Shickich Jr. |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/20/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/20/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/20/2018 | Petition for Writ of Review of Final Order | Petition | Writ - review | Final | |
11/21/2018 | Motion - Admission pro hac vice (Branham) | Motion | Admission pro hac vice | Final | |
11/21/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement sent to J. Shickich, Jr. | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
11/21/2018 | Motion - Admission pro hac vice (Melancon) | Motion | Admission pro hac vice | Final | |
11/29/2018 | Event - Phone Call to appellant - lvm regarding late original and copies of Motion Pro Hac Vice | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
11/30/2018 | Supplement to Petition for Writ of Review of Final Order (Attachment 2 of Petition filed November 20, 2018, hearing transcript, is attached) | Petition | Other | Final | |
12/03/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Renee Malancon (counsel's original signature required), Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles W. Branham III (counsel's original signature required); and Petitioner's Supplement to Petition for Writ of Review of Final Order (counsel's original signature required) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/03/2018 | Order Granting Admission of Attorneys Pro Hac Vice (Melancon and Branham) | Order | Pro hac vice - allow | Final | |
12/05/2018 | Response/Objection - Petition for review (Response and attachments were efiled in order that they appear on website) | Response/Objection | Petition for review | Final | |
12/06/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of Review | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/11/2018 | Order - Denying Petition for Writ of Review | Order | Deny | Final | |
12/11/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |