Case Information: 34673 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERTS VS. MONTERO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D215819 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/27/1999 / Dentico, Michael | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/16/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
08/16/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-07636 | |
08/16/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
08/27/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/07/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from George E. Cromer-check no. 1092. | ||
09/17/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | 99-08835 | |
09/24/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | ||
10/22/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 27, 1999. | 99-10341 | |
11/02/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-10687 | |
12/01/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 99-11978 | |
12/17/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 12, 1999 and August 9, 1999. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. | 99-12825 | |
12/17/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-12827 | |
12/22/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 99-13031 | |
01/28/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. April 19, 1999 and August 9, 1999. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. | 00-01450 | |
02/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of this appeal. Briefing suspended pending further order of this court. | 00-02414 | |
03/06/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 00-03537 | |
03/30/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-05113 | |
04/25/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-06690 | |
04/25/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. | 00-06690 |