judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT ALLEN HOLZHEUSER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-124)
Case Number:06-124Case Docketed On:06/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:ROBERT ALLEN HOLZHEUSER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT ALLEN HOLZHEUSER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Allen HolzheuserD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 160
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/24/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/06/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/23/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time - brief of appellant - no furtherOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/22/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/05/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dana LentNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/25/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; volume III, confidential file; volume IV, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Dana Jill Lent, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding for resentencing.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/02/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/31/07 by D. Olson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal