judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SERE, JOSEPH GUTIERREZ, JOSEPH

Case Information: 80-CV-1220
Short Caption:SERE, JOSEPH GUTIERREZ, JOSEPHClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA12279-78Filed Date:10/14/1980

Opening Event Date:10/14/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/23/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/31/1981
Argued/Submitted:09/09/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SERE, JOSEPH ET AL GUTIERREZ, JOSEPH
10/14/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1981FiledRecord Completed
12/31/1981FiledBriefing Completed
09/09/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/10/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition