judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MADISON, ELLIOT E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1690
Short Caption:MADISON, ELLIOT E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4877-84Filed Date:12/10/1984

Opening Event Date:12/10/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/03/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/12/1985
Argued/Submitted:02/26/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Thomas Guinta YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Judith E. Retchin YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MADISON, ELLIOT E. UNITED STATES
12/10/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/03/1985FiledRecord Completed
08/12/1985FiledBriefing Completed
02/26/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/03/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition