judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN THE MATTER OF: S.H.

Case Information: 83-CM-0302
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF: S.H.Classification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:J2658-82Filed Date:03/07/1983

Opening Event Date:03/07/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Claudia E. Schlosberg NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901IN THE MATTER OF: S.H.
01/01/1906 REISCHELC (TAG) SCHLOSBERGC (TAG)
03/07/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1983FiledRecord Completed
10/24/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition