judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MILTON K. NORTON v. HON. JUDGE RAWLINS, JUDGE OF THE 116TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT OF DALLAS COUNTY, TEXAS

Case: A-734
A-734
11/14/1945
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
MILTON K. NORTON
HON. JUDGE RAWLINS, JUDGE OF THE 116TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT OF DALLAS COUNTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
01/08/1946Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/21/1945Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
12/21/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
11/14/1945Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedRelator
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
05/28/1946Letter Filed
01/31/1946Letter Filed
01/08/1946Brief on the Merits
12/27/1945Amendment to Motion filed
12/21/1945Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/21/1945Brief in Support of Petition
11/29/1945Bond
11/19/1945Document filed (see remarks)
11/16/1945Order from Lower Court filed
11/14/1945Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Judge Rawlins, Judge of the 116th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, TexasRespondent
Milton K. NortonRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information