Case: A-759
A-759
12/10/1945
Application for Writ of Error
BEAUMONT COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY
JAMES FISHER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/1946 | Amended Petition | Petitioner | | |
12/15/1945 | Amended Petition | Petitioner | | |
12/10/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/1946 | Amended Petition | | ||
01/09/1946 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
12/28/1945 | Motion to amend application for writ of error | Filing granted | | |
12/20/1945 | Motion to dismiss | Overruled | | |
12/15/1945 | Amended Petition | | ||
12/15/1945 | Motion to amend application for writ of error | Filing granted | | |
12/13/1945 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
12/10/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/10/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James Fisher | Respondent | |
Beaumont Coca-Cola Bottling Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information