judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF MICHAEL D. HURT, AN EMPLOYEE OF TILTON READY MIX, INC.: MICHAEL D. HURT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-14-0266)
Case Number:S-14-0266Case Docketed On:10/28/2014
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF MICHAEL D. HURT, AN EMPLOYEE OF TILTON READY MIX, INC.: MICHAEL D. HURT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF MICHAEL D. HURT, AN EMPLOYEE OF TILTON READY MIX, INC.: MICHAEL D. HURT, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael D. HurtBernard Q. Phelan
AppelleeDepartment of Workforce Services - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPeter K. Michael
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn
Samantha Caselli

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2015 WY 106
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/28/2014Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/28/2014Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/28/2014Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/28/2014Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/03/2014Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - Samantha Caselli obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
12/11/2014Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/11/2014Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/13/2015Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/13/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2015Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/13/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Errata - Table of AuthoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2015Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/27/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2015Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/18/2015Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2015Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/26/2015Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume 1 - Original Papers; Volume 2 - Confidential File - Unredacted File & Transcript; Volume 3 - Redacted file & TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2015Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2015Notice of Reassignment Following Retirement (Justice Kite)OrderOtherFinal
08/14/2015Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/17/2015Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/17/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Verified Application for FeesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2015Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/15/2015Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/15/2015Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/15/2015Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/23/2015Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/17/2015ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal