Case Heading (S-14-0259) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0259 | Case Docketed On: | 10/23/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Sheridan County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | SHERIDAN NEWSPAPERS, INC. v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF SHERIDAN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT #2, STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | SHERIDAN NEWSPAPERS, INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF SHERIDAN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT #2, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Sheridan Newspapers, Inc. | Bruce T. Moats |
Appellee | Board of Trustees of Sheridan County School District #2, State of Wyoming | Kendal Royce Hoopes |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Public Records |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 70 |
Citation: | 350 P.3d 266 (Wyo. 2015) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/23/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/23/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/23/2014 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
10/23/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
11/19/2014 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/19/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant/Petitioner Sheridan Newspapers, Inc. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/23/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/24/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/07/2015 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
01/09/2015 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
01/09/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant/Petitioner Sheridan Newspapers, Inc. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/12/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/13/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Bruce T. Moats obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/14/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Kendal R. Hoopes obo appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/20/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
01/20/2015 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; volume III, Confidential Folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/20/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
02/11/2015 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice Oral argument notice argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Kite, Davis and Fox (Bruce T. Moats obo Appellant; Kendal Royce Hoopes obo Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
05/14/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversed and remanded with Justice Kite writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
06/01/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
06/01/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
06/01/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
06/01/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
06/04/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record received 6/2/15 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |