Case Information: 38779 | |||
Short Caption: | ARGUELLES (JUAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40832 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175421 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/14/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/14/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. | 01-19025 | |
12/05/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that we lack jurisdiction to entertain this appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-20331 | |
01/02/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-20532 | |
01/02/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. | 01-20532 |