Case: A-763
A-763
12/13/1945
Application for Writ of Error
NAVARRO OIL COMPANY
JOHN T. CROSS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/25/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/13/1946 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
03/05/1946 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/27/1946 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
12/31/1945 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/22/1945 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/13/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/25/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
06/21/1946 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/13/1946 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/12/1946 | Motion to Correct filed | Overruled | | |
03/05/1946 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
02/27/1946 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
01/30/1946 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/30/1946 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/31/1945 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/22/1945 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/13/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
12/13/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Navarro Oil Company | Petitioner | |
John T. Cross | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information