judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BURT, JOAN A. NATIONAL COUNCIL OF NEGRO

Case Information: 80-CV-0109
Short Caption:BURT, JOAN A. NATIONAL COUNCIL OF NEGROClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA8936-76Filed Date:12/17/1979

Opening Event Date:12/17/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/12/1980
Argued/Submitted:03/10/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BURT, JOAN A. NATIONAL COUNCIL OF NEGRO WOMEN INC. ET AL
12/17/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1980FiledRecord Completed
12/12/1980FiledBriefing Completed
03/10/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/03/1981FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition