Case Heading (S-14-0253) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0253 | Case Docketed On: | 10/14/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | MATTHEW P. SNYDER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | MATTHEW P. SNYDER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Matthew P. Snyder | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Eric M. Alden |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Jenny Lynn Craig David L. Delicath Peter K. Michael Joshua Charles Eames |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 91 |
Citation: | 353 P.3d 693 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/14/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/14/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/14/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/01/2014 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
12/01/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/01/2014 | Order - Grant - extension of time - Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
01/12/2015 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/13/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/25/2015 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
02/26/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/06/2015 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
03/17/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/18/2015 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
03/25/2015 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential File; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/25/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
07/15/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/31/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/31/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/31/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
07/31/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/06/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/4/2015. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |