judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PENNIE YOHANNES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1325
Short Caption:PENNIE YOHANNES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6915-84Filed Date:09/10/1984

Opening Event Date:09/10/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/13/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/14/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/27/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPennie Yohannes N
Joseph F. Giordano YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
G. Paul Howes YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YOHANNES, PENNIE UNITED STATES
09/10/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/13/1986FiledRecord Completed
04/14/1986FiledBriefing Completed
06/27/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/07/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition