judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN HATHAWAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-16-0196)
Case Number:S-16-0196Case Docketed On:08/22/2016
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JOHN HATHAWAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN HATHAWAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn HathawayDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Christyne Marie Martens
Emily Jane Soli

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2017 WY 92
Citation:299 P.3d 625 (Wyo. 2017)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/22/2016Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/22/2016Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/22/2016Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/29/2016Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/29/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2016Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/23/2016Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/23/2016Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/19/2016Correspondence - Incoming copies from appellant, no further actionCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/28/2016Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2017Motion - New counsel (Appellant submitted request in the form of a letter. Advised PD and AG of filing) Correspondence delivered to prison mail system 01/20/2017MotionOtherFinal
01/24/2017Event - Phone Call from Public Defender's Office, will not respondEventPhone CallFinal
02/07/2017Order Denying Motion to Terminate Counsel's RepresentationOrderDenyFinal
02/14/2017Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/15/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2017Motion - Appointment of counsel and terminate counsel's representationMotionAppointment of counselFinal
02/27/2017Correspondence - Incoming from Appellant, no action necessaryCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
03/03/2017Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/07/2017Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/07/2017Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Kirk A. Morgan obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/08/2017Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Emily J. Soli obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/16/2017Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, nine volumes. Volumes 1-2, Original Papers; Volume 3, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume 4, Confidential File; Volume 5, Transcripts; Volume 6, Redacted Transcripts; Volume 7, Confidential Unredacted Transcripts; Volume 8, Confidential File; Volume 9, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2017Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/21/2017Order Denying Motion to Terminate Counsel's RepresentationOrderDenyFinal
04/11/2017Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (Kirk A. Morgan o/b/o Appellant; Emily J. Soli o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/07/2017Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirmed in part and reversed in part with Justice Kautz writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/10/2017Service - Certified mail signature return card - Warden received opinion (no date given)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/23/2017Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/23/2017Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/23/2017Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/23/2017Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/28/2017Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by J. Martinez (no date)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/28/2017Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by Diane Sanchez 8/25/17ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal