Case: A-778
A-778
12/22/1945
Application for Writ of Error
INTERNATIONAL PRINTING PRESSMEN AND ASSISTANTS UNION OF NORTH AMERICA
L. R. SMITH
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/1946 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Respondent | | |
10/15/1946 | Reply to Response | Amicus Curiae | | |
10/14/1946 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Respondent | | |
09/28/1946 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
09/24/1946 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
09/19/1946 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/06/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
12/28/1945 | Response to Petition | Respondent | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/29/1947 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
01/22/1947 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/16/1947 | Motion to Stay Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/17/1946 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
10/15/1946 | Reply to Response | | ||
10/14/1946 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
09/28/1946 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
09/24/1946 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
09/19/1946 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
08/23/1946 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/30/1946 | Letter Filed | | ||
03/15/1946 | Bond | | ||
03/13/1946 | Submission reset | | ||
03/06/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
03/06/1946 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/06/1946 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/28/1945 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/22/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
American Federation of Labor | Amicus Curiae | |
L. R. Smith | Respondent | |
International Printing Pressmen and Assistants Union of North America | Petitioner | |
Laundry Workers International Union, et al. | Amicus Curiae | |
Retail Clerks International Protective Association Local Union 663 | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information