Case: 6351
6351
04/07/1932
Application for Writ of Error
PERMIAN OIL COMPANY
J. A. CHAPMAN, PEERLESS OIL AND GAS COMPANY, ET AL., DOUGLAS OIL COMPANY, NELLIE M. HILL, ET AL., W. A. SMITH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1936 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
04/30/1936 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/17/1936 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/01/1936 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
03/04/1935 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
10/01/1934 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
01/19/1933 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
01/18/1933 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/17/1933 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
12/30/1932 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
12/20/1932 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
04/07/1932 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1936 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
04/30/1936 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
04/17/1936 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/01/1936 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
03/04/1935 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
10/16/1934 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/01/1934 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
01/19/1933 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/18/1933 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
01/17/1933 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
12/30/1932 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
12/20/1932 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/07/1932 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Peerless Oil and Gas Company, et al. | Respondent | |
J. A. Chapman | Respondent | |
Douglas Oil Company | Respondent | |
Nellie M. Hill, et al. | Respondent | |
Walter L. Kimmel | Amicus Curiae | |
W. A. Smith, et al. | Respondent | |
Permian Oil Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information