judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0079)
Case Number:S-07-0079Case Docketed On:04/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKent Alan Proffit Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 103
Citation:191 P.3d 974

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/25/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/25/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/12/2007Motion - Stay - other. Motion to stay briefing schedule in anticipation of consolidation of cases.MotionStay - otherFinal
07/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/31/2007Order - Denying motion to stay briefing scheduleOrderDenyFinal
08/23/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/24/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time - no further extensionsOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/26/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. (Note: All attorney's were away at PD Conference, brief had signature stamp, will bring in original signature page on Monday)BriefAppellantFinal
10/01/2007Brief - Other - received page 57 of appellant's original brief with counsel's signatureBriefOtherFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Errata - Brief of the AppellantNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
11/07/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of certification regarding designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, exhibits; Volumes VI-VIII, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Causey for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/10/2008Correspondence - Incoming - Notice of additional authority. (Accepted by e-filing although should have come in under Notice - Incoming. Notified counsel for future reference)CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of additional authority.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/03/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/19/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/23/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Record signed for 9/22/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/11/2008Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court Petition for Writ of Certiorari docketedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
01/30/2009Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court petition for writ of certiorari deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal