Case Information: 80-CM-1332 | |||
Short Caption: | MINNICOZZI, WILLIAM P. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M5918-80 | Filed Date: | 11/04/1980 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/04/1980 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/02/1981 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/24/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/31/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MINNICOZZI, WILLIAM P. UNITED STATES | |||
11/04/1980 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
02/02/1981 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/24/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/31/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/07/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |