Case Information: 35254 | |||
Short Caption: | O'CONNOR VS. PASQUALE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34622 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24380 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/08/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/08/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/08/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-12325 | |
12/08/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
01/20/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 00-00902 | |
02/08/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 02/07/00. | 00-02023 | |
02/08/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/07/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-11622 | |
07/21/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On December 8, 1999, this court issued a notice to appellant to pay the supreme court filing fee required by NRS 2.250. In response, appellant submitted a letter in which appellant claims an exemption from paying the filing fee on the basis that she pursued the action for removal on behalf of the state. Because this court dismissed this appeal on July 7, 2000 , we elect not to examine appellant's claim for fee exemption, as the issue is now moot. | 00-12596 | |
08/01/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13268 | |
08/01/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/08/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2000. | 00-13268 |