Case Information: 35276 | |||
Short Caption: | KELLY VS. CHICHESTER ESTATES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 97CV0181 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/20/1999 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/13/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mary Marsh Linde--check no. 6521. | ||
12/13/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-12466 | |
12/20/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/21/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 11 and 13, 1999. To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. | 99-12998 | |
04/20/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 00-06342 | |
04/20/2000 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 00-06343 | |
05/05/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK | 00-07348 | |
05/05/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |