judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-758
A-758
12/10/1945
Application for Writ of Error
W. C. TURNBOW PETROLEUM CORPORATION
EDWIN M. FULTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/08/1946Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
04/25/1946Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/11/1946Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/06/1946Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/20/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
12/10/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1946Response to Motion filed
05/08/1946Brief in Support of Petition
04/25/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/11/1946Supplement to Response
02/06/1946Reply to Response
01/16/1946Document received (See Remarks)
12/20/1945Response to Petition
12/10/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/10/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edwin M. FultonRespondent
W. C. Turnbow Petroleum CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information