judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF LARAMIE COUNTY d/b/a LARAMIE COUNTY FAIR BOARD OF TRUSTEES v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF LARAMIE COUNTY and LARAMIE COUNTY

Case Heading (S-19-0192)
Case Number:S-19-0192Case Docketed On:08/21/2019
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF LARAMIE COUNTY d/b/a LARAMIE COUNTY FAIR BOARD OF TRUSTEES v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF LARAMIE COUNTY and LARAMIE COUNTY
Full Title:BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF LARAMIE COUNTY d/b/a LARAMIE COUNTY FAIR BOARD OF TRUSTEES, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF LARAMIE COUNTY and LARAMIE COUNTY, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLaramie County Fair Board of TrusteesGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Christopher Michael Brennan
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Laramie County, WyomingSteven F. Freudenthal
AppelleeLaramie CountySteven F. Freudenthal

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Statutes
Opinion Number:2020 WY 41
Citation:460 P.3d 251

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/21/2019Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/21/2019Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/21/2019Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/21/2019Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/04/2019Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/04/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Fair Board of Trustees; and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/18/2019(Appellee's) Motion Suggesting MootnessMotionOtherFinal
11/18/2019Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/18/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees; Motion Suggesting Mootness; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/03/2019Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/03/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's response to Motion Suggesting MootnessEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2019Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/11/2019Order - Oral argument scheduled (Historic Supreme Court Chambers, Wyoming State Capitol Building)OrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/13/2019Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes 1-5, Original Papers; Volume 6, Transcripts - 3.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/17/2019Order on Motion Suggesting MootnessOrderOtherFinal
12/17/2019Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Steve Freudenthal obo AppelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/20/2019Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Christopher M. Brennan obo Appellant (not arguing)Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/20/2019Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Gay Woodhouse obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/16/2020Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Gay V. Woodhouse, Christopher M. Brennan, argument by Ms. Woodhouse o/b/o Appellant; Steven F. Freudenthal o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/24/2020Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing and remanding with Justice Fox writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/09/2020Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/09/2020Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/09/2020Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/09/2020Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2020Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received 4/14/20ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal