Case: A-3034
A-3034
02/12/1951
Application for Writ of Error
COL-TEX REFINING COMPANY
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS AND HOWARD COUNTY PRODUCERS AND ROYALTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/29/1951 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
06/20/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
05/03/1951 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/27/1951 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/19/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/19/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/19/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/08/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/01/1951 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/12/1951 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/29/1951 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/25/1951 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/20/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/06/1951 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/03/1951 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
04/27/1951 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/19/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/19/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/19/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/21/1951 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/08/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/01/1951 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/12/1951 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
02/12/1951 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ira Butler | Amicus Curiae | |
Coffield and Guthrie, Inc. | Amicus Curiae | |
Cantey, Hanger, Johnson, Scarborough and Gooch | Amicus Curiae | |
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY | Amicus Curiae | |
Col-Tex Refining Company | Petitioner | |
Railroad Commission of Texas and Howard County Producers and Royalty Owners Association | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information