Case Information: 34685 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (JEWELL) VS. STATE C/W 34540 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 34540 *, 34685 | Related Case(s): | 34540 , 34591 , 41792 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141966 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/19/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/19/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-07731 | |
09/22/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. fn2[This court directs the clerk of this court to correct the caption on the docket sheet to conform with the caption on this order]. | 99-09020 | |
12/01/1999 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Correct Illegal Sentence filed in district court on November 15, 1999. | 99-12016 | |
09/13/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 34540, 34685. Document No. 00-16154. | ||
10/04/2000 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Motion for Re-Hearing. (Petition for Rehearing). (Nos. 34540 and 34685). | ||
10/18/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 34540, 34685. | 00-18483 | |
11/03/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-18995 | |
11/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 2000. | 00-18995 |