judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICKY EUGENE EWING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-19)
Case Number:06-19Case Docketed On:01/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RICKY EUGENE EWING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICKY EUGENE EWING, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRicky Eugene EwingKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 78
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/15/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
07/17/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
07/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of brief on disk.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/11/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, jury instructions and verdict; volume III, transcripts; volume IV, confidential file.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/14/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Parker for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal