judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VIRGIL JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1687
Short Caption:VIRGIL JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Lead: 82-CF-1562 Consolidated:82-CF-1687
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/17/1982

Opening Event Date:12/17/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/05/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/12/1984
Argued/Submitted:06/08/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVirgil Johnson N
Peter E. George YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Regina C. Mcgranery YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, VIRGIL UNITED STATES
12/17/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/05/1983FiledRecord Completed
01/12/1984FiledBriefing Completed
06/08/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/13/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition