judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HURT, GREGORY HAC

Case Information: 83-AA-0240
Short Caption:HURT, GREGORY HACClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/07/1983

Opening Event Date:03/07/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/06/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGregory Hurt NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Leo N. Gorman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HURT, GREGORY HAC DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
03/07/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/06/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition