Case Information: 34020 | |||
Short Caption: | KIPER (RUSSELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34304 , 34909 , 35950 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153050 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/12/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/12/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-02736 | |
05/03/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML | 99-03518 | |
06/11/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This is a proper person request for permission to file a belated appeal from a judgment of conviction. fn1[Appellant filed an untimely notice of appeal, and this court dismissed the appeal for lack of jurisdiction on May 3, 1999.]. We deny this request. The clerk shallissue remittitur forthwith. fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML | 99-05032 | |
06/11/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-05044 | |
06/11/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/01/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 1999. | 99-05044 |