Case Information: 34011 | |||
Short Caption: | WITTWER VS. CHOI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A374471 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/15/1999 / Ryan, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/06/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/08/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Parker Nelson & Arin, Chtd.--check no. 3257. | ||
04/08/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-02662 | |
04/15/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert D. Ryan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/19/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-03052 | |
04/23/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-03187 | |
07/12/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-06192 | |
07/30/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 99-07014 | |
10/11/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 10/8/99. | 99-09779 | |
10/11/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 99-09780 | |
11/08/1999 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 11/5/99. | 99-10979 | |
12/06/1999 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/03/99. | 99-12192 | |
06/06/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | 00-09469 | |
06/06/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. " We therefore reverse the district court's order and remand this matter to the court for further proceedings." fn1[Appellant argues that this court should presently determine that she participated in good faith during the arbitration program. Without the benefit of the district court's findings and conclusions, we decline to do so.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14547 | |
09/13/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14753 | |
09/13/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/06/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. | 00-14753 |