judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HINES, RUFUS R. DES

Case Information: 83-AA-0260
Short Caption:HINES, RUFUS R. DESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/14/1983

Opening Event Date:03/14/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/31/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/02/1984
Argued/Submitted:07/27/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRufus R. Hines NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Grace Lockett Rosner NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
N. Denise Wilson-Taylor YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HINES, RUFUS R. DES
03/14/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1983FiledRecord Completed
05/02/1984FiledBriefing Completed
07/27/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/03/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition