Case: 08-95-00031-CV
08-95-00031-CV
02/01/1995
Other Personal Injury
The City of El Paso
Zarate, Javier and Maria Zarate, Individually and on Behalf of all Statutory Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Sergio Zarate and Ricardo Zarate, Minors, Deceased
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/10/2000 | Fee paid | | |
06/05/1997 | Order entered | | |
09/16/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/16/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/22/1996 | Fee paid | | |
03/13/1996 | Fee paid | | |
03/04/1996 | Fee paid | | |
02/20/1996 | Fee paid | | |
02/07/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
02/05/1996 | Fee paid | | |
01/23/1996 | Fee paid | | |
01/23/1996 | Fee paid | | |
01/19/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
01/04/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/04/1996 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
01/04/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/29/1995 | Submitted | | |
11/29/1995 | Submission | | |
11/29/1995 | Submitted | | |
09/29/1995 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
09/27/1995 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
09/25/1995 | Submission | | |
08/30/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/11/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
06/27/1995 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
06/14/1995 | Motion for leave to file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/01/1995 | Motion for leave to * filed | | |
05/30/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
05/30/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/30/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/10/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/26/1995 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
04/26/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/03/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
03/15/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/01/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/01/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/01/1995 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
02/01/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |
02/01/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/16/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE CITY OF EL PASO | Appellant | Hon. David C. Caylor Hon. Laura P. Gordon |
ZARATE, JAVIER AND MARIA ZARAT | Appellee | Hon. John C. Schwambach, Jr. Hon. Evelina Ortega |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 4
El Paso
Honorable Kitty Schild
89-2972