Case: A-3069
A-3069
02/27/1951
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
BIRDIE SHILLING
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/17/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
07/03/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/28/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/28/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/27/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/26/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/23/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/20/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/21/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/07/1951 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/27/1951 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/19/1960 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
07/17/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
07/03/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/28/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
06/28/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/27/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/26/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/13/1951 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
06/13/1951 | Opinion issued | | ||
04/23/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/20/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/16/1951 | Miscellaneous Motion | Overruled | | |
03/21/1951 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/21/1951 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/21/1951 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/21/1951 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/07/1951 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/27/1951 | Additional Copies received | | ||
02/27/1951 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Amarillo | Amicus Curiae | |
Birdie Shilling | Respondent | |
City of Houston | Petitioner | |
CITY OF BEAUMONT | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Dallas | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Worth, et al. | Amicus Curiae | |
I. M. Singer | Amicus Curiae | |
CITY OF MCALLEN | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Tyler | Amicus Curiae | |
Travis White, City Attorney of the City of El Paso | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information