Case Heading (S-19-0197) | |||||
Case Number: | S-19-0197 | Case Docketed On: | 08/30/2019 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Second Judicial District Albany County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | DAVID W. ALANIZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION | ||||
Full Title: | DAVID W. ALANIZ, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | David W. Alaniz | Sarah Grams Robison Phillips |
Appellee | Department of Workforce Services - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Bridget L. Hill Michael James McGrady James Clarence Demers Kelly Mullen Donoho |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/30/2019 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/30/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Final | |
08/30/2019 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/30/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/30/2019 | Order Sanctioning Appellant's Counsel | Order | Sanction - notice of appeal | Final | |
09/24/2019 | Order Dismissing Appeal | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
09/30/2019 | Event - Phone Call to appellant's counsel re: sanction fee, Sarah said she overnighted the money order, should be rcvd. 10/1/2019 | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
10/01/2019 | Fees - Sanctions received - NOA | Fees | Sanctions received - NOA | Final | |
10/09/2019 | Motion - Reinstatement of case | Motion | Reinstatement of case | Final | |
10/14/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Reinstatement of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/29/2019 | Order - Denying Petition for Reinstatement of Appeal | Order | Deny | Final | |
10/29/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |