Case Information: 37007 | |||
Short Caption: | BROWN (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157791 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/02/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/16/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/16/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-20118 | |
01/05/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36976, 36978, 36994, 37007, 37032, 37051, 37072. | 01-00257 | |
05/02/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 01-07403 | |
05/02/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/02/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court Affirmed.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-00055 | |
01/29/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-00601 | |
01/29/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/13/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. | 02-00601 |