Case: 00-0379
00-0379
04/13/2000
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
JOHN W. TEETS and TERESA J. BURROFF
JOHN PATTON, RONALD S. DRIVER and VON KREISLER and SWANSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/24/2000 | Case Stored | location 39-D | | |
06/20/2000 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | M/E/T to file petition is July 21, 2000. Petitition is due July 21, 2000. | |
06/19/2000 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Petitioners' 2nd m/e/t to file petition for review | | |
04/14/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petitioners' m/e/t to file petition for review was granted until 06-21-00; pet ition is due 06-21-00 | |
04/14/2000 | Petition due | Petition is due 06-21-00 | | |
04/13/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | On behalf John W. Teets and Teresa J. Burroff | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/24/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 39-D |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BURROFF, TERESA J. | Petitioner | Mr. E. Lee Parsley |
PATTON, JOHN | Respondent | Ms. Susan J. Haney |
VON KREISLER AND SWANSON | Respondent | Ms. Susan J. Haney |
TEETS, JOHN W. | Petitioner | Mr. E. Lee Parsley |
DRIVER, RONALD S. | Respondent | Ms. Susan J. Haney |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-99-00065-CV
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information