judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00494-CR
14-89-00494-CR
06/02/1989
All Misdemeanors
Scott, Charles E.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/1990Case stored
03/28/1990Mandate Issued
03/28/1990Mandate Issued
03/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
02/07/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/18/1989Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/11/1989Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/28/1989Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
11/06/1989No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
10/05/1989Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STADENIED
09/15/1989Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA
09/07/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/07/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/17/1989No description available.
08/10/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/31/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/19/1989No description available.
07/17/1989Transcript FILED
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
05/17/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCharles J. Sebesta, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Nick P. Malant
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Washington
Honorable HAROLD ROBERT TOWSLEE
9946
$200/$750 fine