judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8717
C-8717
06/02/1989
App Writ Err (2) Originally filed as 130(d)
ALFRED L. HEATON
STEWART EDWARD JAMES FULTON ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/15/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondenton behalf of Dave Masner Ins. Agency.
10/01/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
09/24/1990Motion for RehearingPetitionerMo/Re due 09-21-90
04/25/1990Exhibits in case/cause filedPOSTERS
09/28/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF DAVE MASNERSequence #: 02
09/07/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF S.E.J. FULTON & THOSE UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONSequence #: 02
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP WRIT ERR # 1 - ALFRED L. HEATONSequence #: 01
07/20/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentHEATON'S REPLY TO MASNER'S APP
07/05/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP ON BEHALF OF DAVE MASNER INS.Sequence #: 02
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/13/1992Exhibits returned to the lower court clerks4 lg. posterboard exhibits returned to 1st CA (inadvertently omitted when original record returned on 12/20/90.
01/22/1991Returned document(s). See Remarks.second mo/re returned pursuant to Rule 190(d)
01/14/1991Notice from Counsel of a change in addressof atty/Bradley M. Bingham
01/03/1991Motion for rehearing receivedPet's Second Mo/Re to App Writ Of Error. FORWARDED
12/20/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksOnly one copy of Reply of David Masner Agency, filed 10-01-90 & One Copy of Reply to Rehearing 10-15-90
12/20/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsRehearing Overruled
12/19/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledRehearing Overruled
10/15/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedon behalf of Dave Masner Ins. Agency.
10/04/1990Notice requesting filing feeReply of Dave Masner Ins. Agency To Mo Re - $5.00
10/01/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
09/28/1990Notice requesting filing feeReply to Mo Re - $5.00
09/24/1990Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
09/24/1990Motion for RehearingMo/Re due 09-21-90
09/24/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
09/06/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
09/06/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedPetition improvidently granted; Order denying petition withdrawn; Petition deniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
09/06/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnPetition improvidently granted; Order denying petition withdrawn; Petition deniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
09/06/1990App Writ Err reinstated to docket for reconsiderationCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
09/06/1990App Writ Err reinstated to docket for reconsiderationCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
09/06/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedbehalf/Dave Masner Insurance Agency
09/06/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedbehalf/Alfred L. Heaton
09/06/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.Order of 3/21/90 granting apps/behalf/Alfred L. Heaton and Dave Masner Insurance Agency w/d as improvident grants.
04/25/1990Exhibits in case/cause filedPOSTERS
04/18/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
04/18/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
04/18/1990Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET FOR RUSSELL MCMAINS/ ARGUED FOR RESP BY ANDREW WOOLEY & ROGER D. HIGGINS
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/21/1990Amount of time allotted for oral argument.HEATON 20 MIN; LLOYDS 20 MIN; DAVE MASNER INSURANCE AGENCY 10 MIN; REBUTTAL 10 MINUTES.
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling granted#1 (HEATON) PTS. 1,2,3,4,5,6,7,8,9, 10 AND 11.
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling granted#2 (MASNER) POINT #1.
03/21/1990Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
09/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/28/1989No description available.
09/28/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF DAVE MASNERSequence #: 02
09/11/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedON BEHALF OF DAVE MASNER
09/07/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF S.E.J. FULTON & THOSE UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONSequence #: 02
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP WRIT ERR # 1 - ALFRED L. HEATONSequence #: 01
07/20/1989Brief filed that is difficult to read due to color
07/20/1989Reply to ResponseHEATON'S REPLY TO MASNER'S APP
07/05/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP ON BEHALF OF DAVE MASNER INS.Sequence #: 02
06/02/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
06/02/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filedON BEHALF OF ALFRED L. HEATON
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/20/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STEWART EDWARD JAMES FULTON ETRespondentMr. Andrew Wooley
DAVE MASNER INSURANCE AGENCYRespondentMr. David M. Taylor
THOSE UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDSRespondentMr. Andrew Wooley
HEATON, ALFRED L.PetitionerMr. Robert D. Rapp
Mr. Russell H. McMains
Ms. Kimberley Hall Seger
Court of Appeals Information:
01-86-00866-CV
Rev/Rem/Rev/Ren
RULE 90, 09-29-88
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable SAM BASS
Trial Court Information
281st District Court
Harris
Honorable Louis M. Moore
79-54751