Case Information: 80-CM-0855 | |||
Short Caption: | SILVER, DICK R., UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M5724-79 | Filed Date: | 06/18/1980 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/18/1980 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/09/1981 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/22/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/28/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SILVER, DICK R., a/k/a JAMES R. SILVER UNITED STATES | |||
06/18/1980 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/09/1981 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/22/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/28/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/30/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |