judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARMICHAEL, ALBERT UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0092
Short Caption:CARMICHAEL, ALBERT UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:82-CF-0092Consolidated: 83-CM-0932
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:01/22/1982

Opening Event Date:01/22/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/17/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/05/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Dennis M. HartNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CARMICHAEL, ALBERT AKA ARTHUR CARMICHAEL UNITED STATES
01/22/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1982FiledRecord Completed
01/06/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/05/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/07/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition