Case Information: 35162 | |||
Short Caption: | BROPHY VS. NORBLAD | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV14738 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/24/1999 / Cohen, Larry | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/22/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. | ||
11/22/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Terzich & Jackson, Ltd.--check no. 8851. | ||
11/22/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-11643 | |
11/24/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/08/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Juge will attempt to meet with the respective attorneys when he is in the Carson City area later this month for a settlement conference in another case. The Settlement Judge will submit a follow-up report to the course following that meeting. | 00-09677 | |
07/03/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are negotiating. | 00-11292 | |
09/13/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Interim Settlement Conference Report. The Settlement Judge will update this report after he speaks further with counsel for the parties and determines whether a further settlement conference will be conducted. | 00-16106 | |
10/20/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 31, 2000. | 00-18630 | |
11/27/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Interim Settlement Conference Report. | 00-20642 | |
12/11/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Interim Settlement Conference Report. Regarding attorney for appellant has withdrawn from representing her in this matter due to retirement. Ms. Brophy has stated her intention to retain new counsel. Settlement Judge request that this matter be retained in the settlement conference program for a reasonable period of time while she tries to secure new representation. | 00-21619 | |
12/26/2000 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Interim Settlement Conference Report. Settlement conference is scheduled for January 22, 2001. | 00-22473 | |
01/26/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-01793 | |
02/07/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 01-02490 | |
02/20/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK | 01-03103 | |
02/20/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |