judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00228-CV
13-89-00228-CV
06/02/1989
Contract
Schindler, Charles J.
Shaw, John and Travis Shaw Long
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1990Mandate Issued
03/19/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
12/21/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Motion for Leave to File List of Authorities
12/11/1989Document Filed
12/11/1989LIST OF AUTHORITIES RECEIVED
12/07/1989Submitted
12/07/1989Submission
11/28/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
10/18/1989Submission
09/12/1989Brief Filed
09/12/1989Oral argument requested
09/05/1989Certificate Filed
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/1989Certificate Filed
08/18/1989Brief Filed
08/18/1989Motion for leave to file brief
08/18/1989Oral argument requested
08/18/1989Appellant's Brief Received
08/18/1989Case ready to be set
07/10/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/10/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
07/10/1989Statement of Facts Received
07/10/1989Filing Fee Paid
07/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/26/1989Due date for record to be filed
06/13/1989Filing Fee Paid
06/02/1989Transcript Filed
06/02/1989Transcript Received
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
267th District Court
Refugio
Honorable Whayland W Kilgore
88-8-6428