Case: 11-00-00051-CR
11-00-00051-CR
02/07/2000
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Rodney Walsh
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
02/07/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/2003 | Mot. on extension of time disposed in CCA | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/10/2003 | Mandate issued | | |
10/15/2003 | Habeas Corpus Petition Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/31/2001 | Yearly opinion book | | |
08/29/2001 | Mandate issued | | |
05/31/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed as Reformed | |
05/24/2001 | Submitted | | |
04/20/2001 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
02/01/2001 | Mot. - To file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/01/2001 | Brief filed | | |
02/01/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/23/2001 | Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article | | |
01/23/2001 | Brief received | | |
01/04/2001 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/22/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
11/16/2000 | Mot. - To file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/16/2000 | Brief filed | | |
11/06/2000 | Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article | | |
11/06/2000 | Brief received | | |
10/26/2000 | Late brief inquiry | | |
10/26/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/23/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
10/16/2000 | Late brief inquiry | | |
10/05/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/29/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
09/07/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/05/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
07/21/2000 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |
07/14/2000 | Item returned to clerk's office, lawyer, etc. | | |
07/14/2000 | Record received | | |
05/17/2000 | Late record inquiry | | |
04/25/2000 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |
04/05/2000 | Late record inquiry | | |
03/01/2000 | Record received | | |
02/29/2000 | Late record inquiry | | |
02/07/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
02/07/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
01/18/2000 | No Description Available. | | |
11/16/1999 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
11/16/1999 | Sentenced in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/29/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Walsh, Rodney | Criminal - Appellant | Roger Bridgwater |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ken Magidson, District Attorney |
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
Honorable Jon N. Hughes, Judge
789,076
35 yrs