judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36708
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J51406Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal (via fax). 00-15766
09/07/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal (via fax). 00-15805
09/08/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal (via fax). 00-15821
09/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion to file a reply to respondent's opposition to the motion for stay. The clerk shall forthwith file the reply provisionally received on September 7, 2000. 00-15838
09/08/2000MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal. 00-15815
09/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order to Show Cause, Granting Temporary Stay, and Directing Supplemental Authorities. The State shall have 10 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and to file points and authorities addressing whether this court should elect to treat the State's motion for a stay as a petition for a writ of mandamus challenging the juvenile court's decision and seeking a stay of the juvenile court proceedings. The State shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve supplemental points and authorities addressing the merits of its position in this matter. Respondent shall have 15 days thereafter to file and serve a response. We grant a temporary stay pending receipt and consideration of the supplemental authorities. We hereby stay the juvenile court's September 5, 2000, order denying the request for certification to adult status, and any further proceedings of the juvenile court in case number J51406 pending further order of this court. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] 00-15880
09/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal. (Original--filed via fax on 9/7/00) 00-15934
09/14/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 23, 2000, and September 7, 2000. To Court Reporter: D. Casper. 00-16197
09/15/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 23, 2000, and September 7, 2000. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 00-16321
09/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SEALED). Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant. 00-16384
09/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SEALED) (Second NOA). 00-16385
09/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Filed via fax. OK per AH. 00-16452
09/21/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Reply to Order Filed September 8, 2000. 00-16710
09/29/2000Other Other. Filed Response in Opposition to State's Reply Filed September 18, 2000 (via fax). 00-17268
10/02/2000Other Other. Filed Response in Opposition to State's Reply Filed September 18, 2000 (ORIGINAL--filed via fax on 9/29/00). 00-17310
10/04/2000Other Other. Filed Response by Eighth Judicial District Court, The Honorable Robert E. Gaston, to District Attorney's Reply to Nevada Supreme Court Order from September 8, 2000. 00-17595
10/04/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (to Hon. Robert E. Gaston) Due date: 5 days.
10/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Reply to Order (Susan Roske, Deputy P.D.) 00-18063
10/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Reply to Order (Johnathan VanBoskerck). 00-18065
12/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Construing Appeal as Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Denying Petition. fn1[The clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] " . . . we deny this petition for a writ of mandamus." fn2[We vacate our order imposing a temporary stay entered on September 8, 2000.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-21122
12/14/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-21858
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-21232
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion to Publish. We have considered the motion, and we decline to publish the order. We deny the real party in interest's motion. 01-01219
01/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 19, 2000, appellant submitted a late docketing statement. On December 12, 2000, this court entered an order that construed appellant's appeal as a petition for writ of mandamus and denied the petition. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the docketing statement received on October 19, 2000. 01-02112
01/31/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Clark County Public Defender: returned unfiled, the original Docketing Statement received October 19, 2000.