Case Heading (S-15-0246) | |||||
Case Number: | S-15-0246 | Case Docketed On: | 10/15/2015 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Platte County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | NITA COLETTE MILAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | NITA COLETTE MILAM, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Nita Colette Milam | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/15/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/15/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/15/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/15/2015 | Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Kautz | Notice-Internal | Recusal memo | Final | |
11/23/2015 | Motion - Stay briefing - unopposed | Motion | Stay briefing - unopposed | Final | |
11/24/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/01/2015 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
12/02/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/02/2015 | Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
12/08/2015 | Order Granting Motion to Stay Briefing | Order | Granting stay | Final | |
02/25/2016 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Final | |
02/29/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/29/2016 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
02/29/2016 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |