judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RANDOLPH, CALVIN L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0813
Short Caption:RANDOLPH, CALVIN L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F949-78Filed Date:07/10/1980

Opening Event Date:07/10/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/1982
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RANDOLPH, CALVIN L. UNITED STATES
07/10/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/11/1982FiledRecord Completed
10/13/1982FiledBriefing Completed
12/07/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/03/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition