judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOMBSTONE EXPLORATIONS VS. CLOGAU

Case Information: 34654
Short Caption:TOMBSTONE EXPLORATIONS VS. CLOGAUCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9900581Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1999 / Evans, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Walther Key Maupin Oats Cox Klaich & Legoy--check no. 60867.
08/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07444
08/17/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 30, 1999. To Court Reporter: Sierra Nevada Reporters. 99-07676
08/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret Springgate Evans. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/24/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. June 30, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Kate Ramage. 99-07895
09/14/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Application for New Settlement Judge. 99-08668
03/13/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have settled this matter without the need for further mediation. 00-03956
03/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-04900
04/20/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-06356
05/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 20, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. While parties may agree to voluntarily dismiss an appeal, this court will only dismiss an appeal with prejudice. The parties shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal with prejudice or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-08392
06/05/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Withdraw Appeal. 00-09433
06/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-10132
06/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.